Accounts and annual returns THE LISTENING CENTRE

Charity Number: 1098571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 21 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 April 2024 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 April 2024 71 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 March 2023 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 February 2022 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 February 2022 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late Download Open in new window