THE LISTENING CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Listening Centre provides an affordable counselling service to individuals on limited incomes who live in and around Oxford. Counsellors & Psychotherapists in training support the service on an unpaid basis.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
22 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 15 July 2003: Standard registration
- TLC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Graham | Chair | 22 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Susanne Mary Connick | Trustee | 09 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Ann Tapper | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.40k | £37.26k | £40.86k | £32.99k | £59.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.03k | £22.50k | £41.47k | £41.97k | £56.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 April 2024 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 59 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 February 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 February 2021 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED 18 JANUARY 2003, 21 JUNE 2003, 20 JUNE 2004, 28 APRIL 2007 AND 10 MAY 2008 as amended on 09 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
To relieve the needs of people with mental health issues in Oxfordshire and the surrounding area by the provision of counselling and psychotherapy services.
Area of benefit
BLACKBIRD LEYS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Donnington Community Centre
Townsend Square
OXFORD
OX4 4BB
- Phone:
- 0000000000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window