Governing document THE LISTENING CENTRE
Charity Number: 1098571

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED 18 JANUARY 2003, 21 JUNE 2003, 20 JUNE 2004, 28 APRIL 2007 AND 10 MAY 2008 as amended on 09 Nov 2024
Charitable objects
To relieve the needs of people with mental health issues in Oxfordshire and the surrounding area by the provision of counselling and psychotherapy services.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
BLACKBIRD LEYS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.