THE BREAST CANCER ACTION GROUP (WOLVERHAMPTON & DISTRICT)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide assistance and friendship within an informal group setting. With the emphasis on providing positive support and information to those who have experienced Breast Cancer. Work together and are involved with healthcare professionals. Raise funds to improve the quality of local breast cancer patients requirements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 07 February 2003: Standard registration
- B.C.A.G. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gill Phillips | Chair | 04 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Karen Lee Wilkinson-Glancy | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tina Richardson | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.99k | £1.91k | £2.43k | £5.98k | £5.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.29k | £2.87k | £4.18k | £41.71k | £130 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 March 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 November 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 JANUARY 2003.
Charitable objects
1. TO SUPPORT PATIENT'S WHO HAVE UNDERGONE BREAST SURGERY AND TREATMENT THROUGH A REGULAR PROGRAMME OF INFORMATIVE MEETINGS AND INDIVIDUAL TELEPHONE SUPPORT. 2. TO RAISE FUNDS TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF BREAST CANCER PATIENT'S REQUIREMENTS, BY CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS EQUIPMENT FOR ANY ASPECT OF TREATMENT AND COMFORTS [IN ADDITION TO NHS FUNDING] FOR THE ROYAL WOLVERHAMPTON HOSPITAL TRUST AND OTHER RELEVANT LOCAL CANCER INSTITUTIONS. 3. TO SUPPORT THE WORK OF THE BREAST CARE TEAM AT THE ROYAL WOLVERHAMPTON HOSPITAL TRUST, BY LIASING AND WORKING TOGETHER TO IMPROVE THE SERVICE OFFERED TO PATIENT'S AND TO CREATE A DEDICATED BREAST CANCER UNIT AT THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMPTON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Whitley Close
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV6 8BA
- Phone:
- 01902743550
- Email:
- gillphillips@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window