MISS MURIEL LIDDIATT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1097541
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity pays the income of the trust fund for the benefit of such exclusively charitable objects and purposes in any part of the world as the trustee may in its absolute discretion think fit. The charity awards grants to charitable institutions. The trust manager reviews applications for grants when received and grants are awarded at the trustee's discretion.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £36,718
Total expenditure: £33,735

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 15 May 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LUDLOW TRUST COMPANY (SOUTHAMPTON) LTD Trustee
JEHANGIR MANEK ANKLESARIA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ERNEST MORRIS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LINMARDON TRUST
Received: On time
THE MERRICK AND HEATH FUND
Received: On time
THE SYDNEY & OLGA BRAXTON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE ELDA LATIN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PHYLLIS EILEEN BROOKS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE VIOLET DELANEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
PETER CURZON ORAM CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MR AND MRS Y A WAHAB TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE MARY HEAP CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAUL AND RACHEL JEFFREYS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE RICHARD AND LILLIAN WOODS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE MARGARET GLADYS GRIMES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOHN HOWARD & DENISE FRANCES MERRY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE BRENDA LORRAINE THOMAS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WILLLIAM MALCOLM LAW WILL TRUST
Received: On time
MISS JOAN FRANCES BRACKIN DECEASED CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LATE JOHN VALENTINE LEAROYD TRUST
Received: On time
GEORGE AND GRACE HART TRUST FUND
Received: On time
THE JEAN MARY GOWANS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
AUDREY KNOWLES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
A J H ASHBY WILL TRUST
Received: On time
THE LILIAN AND KENNETH HARRISON TRUST
Received: On time
MARY LEAPMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
EDMUND HERBERT ST PATRICK WHITE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DR BRAHMA DUTT MEMORIAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE SIR EDWARD HOLDEN EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
THE MOLLY DE GUNST ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
DOUBLEDAY RESEARCH FELLOWSHIP
Received: On time
THE JOHN SLATER FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE SYDNEY SMITH TRUST
Received: On time
WILLIAM FRANK PINN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE KINGSLEY LARK ENDOWMENT
Received: On time
BELSIZE CHARITABLE TRUST NO 2
Received: On time
THE MARK CASEY MEMORIAL CHARITY
Received: On time
DEREK PRITCHARD TRUST
Received: On time
THE DAVID RICHARD BELL AND ROSEMARY ELIZABETH BELL CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE WILLIAM ARTHUR WEDDELL TRUST
Received: On time
BERYL DOREEN THOMAS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
CJA NICHOLLS DECEASED CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MARY SINCLAIR WATSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAUL AND JENNIFER GIBBONS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
JOSEF WATT CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
SHAW MEADES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HAROLD CHARLES DARNEY DECEASED
Received: On time
THE DENNIS HOOLEY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAMELA EDMUNDSON/CONNOLLY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
BAIN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DOROTHY BRIDGE GRIFFITH CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
DAVID BRIAN DAVIES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE NORA MILBURN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE JOHN RAYMOND TIJOU CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HARRY FIELDSEND HAWLEY RESIDUARY FUND
Received: On time
THE MPG CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE DORIS LOUISE HAILES CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
FREDERICK GEORGE DRAY, RESIDUARY ESTATE TRUST
Received: On time
THE C M LOWE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
HERBERT DAY TRUST
Received: On time
MAUREEN BATEMAN CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £31.32k £22.03k £19.18k £26.92k £36.72k
Total expenditure £56.99k £42.27k £37.31k £43.79k £33.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 02 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 02 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 03 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
HSBC Trust Company (UK) Limited
Forum 1
2nd Floor
The Forum
Parkway
Whiteley
Phone:
02380 722525
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available