PENNYMOOR PRESCHOOL NURSERY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides pre-school activities for children aged 2 years to 5 years fron the local comunnity. The pre-school is regulated by Ofstead. Also provides training for staff, students and volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income includes £41,604 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 30 December 2003: Standard registration
- 26 November 2024: Funds received from 1107462 GORSYBANK PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
peter george silverlock | Trustee | 26 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pasty McCormick | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JENNA SPENCER | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Williams | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
DOROTHY DAVID | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.62k | £48.48k | £46.44k | £32.89k | £45.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.15k | £45.59k | £42.17k | £37.02k | £46.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £3.55k | £2.10k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £20.94k | £34.48k | £44.76k | £29.68k | £41.60k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 180 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2024 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 04 June 2024 | 217 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 OCTOBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIM OF THE PRE-SCHOOL EARNING ALLIANCE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE STONYDELPH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Community Centre
26 Pennymoor Road
Wilnecote
Tamworth
B77 4LG
- Phone:
- 0182783078
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window