THE COMMUNITY OF INTERBEING UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We support, advance and encourage the study and practice of Buddhism and mindful living in accordance with the teachings of meditation master Thich Nhat Hanh, in the UK and overseas, in keeping with the Five Mindfulness Trainings of the Order of Interbeing (Tiep Hien). We assist and encourage the formation and activities of regional and local groups having this common purpose.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 25 March 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET SAMANTHA HEMPSALL | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
William Steele Robinson | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phuong Linh Tran Quach | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Esteban Andres Ruseler | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Miles Francis Dunmore | Trustee | 10 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Philip Anthony Croton | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Angela Searle | Trustee | 30 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jonathan Edwards | Trustee | 06 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £254.67k | £278.04k | £266.89k | £317.44k | £314.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £146.13k | £255.10k | £133.57k | £244.84k | £262.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 February 2021 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 February 2021 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 20 DECEMBER 2002 AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION AMENDED 24 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE, SUPPORT AND ENCOURAGE THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF BUDDHISM AND MINDFUL LIVING IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF MEDITATION MASTER THICH NHAT HANH, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, IN KEEPING WITH THE FIVE BUDDHIST MINDFULNESS TRAININGS AND THE FOURTEEN MINDFULNESS TRAININGS OF THE ORDER OF INTERBEING (TIEP HIEN); (II) TO ASSIST AND ENCOURAGE THE FORMATION AND ACTIVITIES OF REGIONAL AND LOCAL GROUPS HAVING THIS COMMON PURPOSE..
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
SUNNYSIDE HOUSE
SOUTH VIEW TERRACE
YATTON
BRISTOL
BS49 4AH
- Phone:
- 07785 352714
- Email:
- treasurer@plumvillage.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window