THE EXOTIC ANIMAL WELFARE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 May 2003: Standard registration
- 07 July 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- E A W T (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102.95k | £60.94k | £26.61k | £11.77k | £3.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.44k | £56.93k | £11.60k | £12.37k | £16.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 27 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 27 March 2008 | 56 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 27 March 2008 | 56 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 20 March 2008 | 414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 20 March 2008 | 414 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 10 March 2006 | 38 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 10 March 2006 | 38 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 09 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 31 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
I)TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO AND TO CARE FOR SICK AND NEGLECTED REPTILES AND OTHER EXOTIC ANIMALS. II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROVIDE TRAINING IN THE CARE AND WELFARE OF EXOTIC ANIMALS IN CAPTIVITY III)TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT ENDANGERED SPECIES AND THEIR NATURAL HABITATS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window