Financial history THE HANDS AROUND THE WORLD CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1097626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £258.81k £205.99k £205.11k £295.31k £309.06k
Total expenditure £243.52k £188.69k £182.44k £225.23k £226.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.68k N/A N/A