THE CHILD PSYCHOTHERAPY TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 April 2003: Standard registration
- 11 February 2009: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 03 June 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 03 June 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION DATED 10TH DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES BY ADVANCING EDUCATION ABOUT THE APPLICATION OF PSYCHOANALYTIC PRINCIPLES AND TECHNIQUES TO THE STUDY OF CHILD DEVELOPMENT AND TO THE UNDERSTANDING AND TREATMENT OF EMOTIONAL AND OR PSYCHOLOGICAL DISTURBANCES IN CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window