HEADWAY ROTHERHAM

Charity number: 1097470
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Headway Rotherham exists to promote understanding of all aspects of brain injury and to provide information, support and services to people with brain injury, their families and carers.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £159,296
Total expenditure: £37,708

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnsley
  • Doncaster
  • Rotherham
  • Sheffield City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 May 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ewan Bain Chair 01 September 2021
None on record
Ellie Alicia Whotton Trustee 07 June 2023
None on record
Karen Cawood Trustee 07 September 2021
None on record
Susan Hodgson Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record
LINDA MUNFORD Trustee 17 June 2013
None on record
JENNY WOODWARD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £50.90k £30.39k £62.13k £23.75k £159.30k
Total expenditure £37.92k £37.07k £17.12k £36.00k £37.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 30 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 July 2022 14 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 14 July 2022 14 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 30 June 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 29 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 June 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Victoria Park Hall
Victoria Rosehill Park
Rawmarsh
Rotherham
S62 7HJ
Phone:
01709 524100