MAKING A DIFFERENCE - TAMESIDE

Charity number: 1103513
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We are a Mental Health Life Skills Rehabilitation service for people who have long term emotional and social problems. Until we have new premises we are offering support in the community. The skills training offered are: budgeting , household management, relationships and social skills. Training is given in understanding and developing good Emotional Health in relation to good Mental Health.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £14,376
Total expenditure: £15,259

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Derbyshire
  • Manchester City
  • Oldham
  • Stockport
  • Tameside

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 April 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • M A D T (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jack Lyons Chair 14 September 2022
None on record
Paul Wainwright Trustee 30 September 2023
None on record
Linda McKinney Trustee 04 June 2018
None on record
Spencer William Hogg Trustee 26 September 2016
None on record
BEVERLY WARNER Trustee
None on record
MICHAEL WHITTLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £85.32k £75.58k £21.74k £35.38k £14.38k
Total expenditure £81.73k £83.71k £43.68k £32.04k £15.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £5.70k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 26 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2023 13 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 13 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 26 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 20 April 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 19 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE HAVEN
168 CLARENDON ROAD
HYDE
SK14 2JY
Phone:
01613432736