THE HEADS OF THE VALLEYS GATEWAY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide a weekly club for adults with learning difficulties, from 18 years old+. We befriend, do craft work, games, talk, we also take members to the cinema, meals out in local pub/restaurant, day trips to South Wales/West Wales/also West Country & Midlands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 April 2022
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Blaenau Gwent
Governance
- 05 March 2003: Standard registration
- 26 June 2023: Funds received from 505687 ABERTILLERY AND DISTRICT MENCAP SOCIETY
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN EVANS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
LINDSEY EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PEARL JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
YVONNE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHELLE SAINSBURY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/04/2017 | 29/04/2019 | 29/04/2020 | 29/04/2021 | 29/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.62k | £4.30k | £6.47k | £0 | £1.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.67k | £3.99k | £4.41k | £0 | £502 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 81 days | |
Annual return | 29 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 446 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 446 days | |
Annual return | 29 April 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 April 2021 | 31 January 2023 | 337 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 April 2020 | 31 January 2023 | 702 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE LOCALITY OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED THEREOF BY REASON OF LEARNING DISABILITY WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
TREDEGAR
Contact information
- Address:
-
48 Peacehaven
TREDEGAR
Gwent
NP22 4BX
- Phone:
- 07977970056
- Email:
- PEARL.JONES1969@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window