AL NAGASHI ISLAMIC AND CULTURAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Al Nagashi Islamic and Cultural Trust is a force for good within our communities. Fueled by the compassion of dedicated volunteers, they work directly with grassroots members, offering crucial advice, referrals, and pathways to mainstream services. Through impactful events and awareness initiatives, they provide vital support, and their inclusive cultural events warmly welcome individuals from all
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 December 2003: Standard registration
- ECET (Working name)
- THE ERITREAN CULTURAL AND EDUCATIONAL TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Othmane Fakhi | Chair | 16 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sadeq Yusuf | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.92k | £6.90k | £823 | £5.23k | £7.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.01k | £5.87k | £793 | £4.01k | £7.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 April 2025 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 April 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 04 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 14 April 2022 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/11/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 04/12/2010
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE AND PROMOTE THE FAITH AND RELIGION OF ISLAM. 2 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR ERITREAN MUSLIMS IN THE TEACHINGS AND RELIGION OF ISLAM, THE CULTURE AND THE LANGUAGE OF ERITREA AND THEIR GENERAL EDUCATION. 3. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF ERITREAN MUSLIMS IN PARTICULAR AND MUSLIMS IN GENERAL WHO IN NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT THROUGH THE DISTRIBUTION OF THE ZAKAT AND OTHER FUNDING SOURCES. 4 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTS OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 South Parade
Mollison Way
EDGWARE
Middlesex
HA8 5QL
- Phone:
- 07542658756
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window