BROXTOWE WOMEN'S PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Broxtowe Women's Project is a women's aid organisation offering a domestic violence outreach, information & awareness service in the Broxtowe Borough of Nottinghamshire. website: www.broxtowewomensproject.org.uk
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 28 February 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 07 July 2003: Standard registration
- 14 January 2010: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 14 January 2010: Funds transferred to 1125946 BROXTOWE WOMEN'S PROJECT LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 28/02/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £119.09k | £146.42k | £149.28k | £110.48k | £117.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £108.30k | £137.89k | £119.06k | £118.87k | £107.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2009 | 17 September 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2009 | 14 October 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 01 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 14 January 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 06 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 12 December 2007 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 14 December 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 19 December 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 13 January 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 13 January 2006 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 8 MAY 2002 AS AMENDED 4 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AND PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SERVICES DIRECTED TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND SUPPORT OF PERSONS WHO HAVE SUFFERED SUCH ABUSE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window