Trustees THE FRIENDS OF KEMPSFORD SCHOOL

Charity number: 1097145
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jaclyn Clapton Trustee 15 March 2025
None on record
Hannah Dickens Trustee 15 January 2025
None on record
Megan Heavisides Trustee 01 February 2023
None on record
Vikki Chesterman Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Hannah Caroline Brooks Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record
Adele Newson Trustee 16 September 2021
None on record