Financial history LILFORD COMMUNITY DAYCARE CENTRE

Charity number: 1101012
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £270.45k £210.98k £187.19k £191.07k £173.55k
Total expenditure £265.28k £251.17k £199.39k £179.04k £182.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0