Trustees DORE COMMUNITY TRANSPORT

Charity number: 1097172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROGER MALCOLM BRADLEY Chair 29 June 2012
None on record
jean mary hope wise Trustee 01 January 2022
None on record
Peter Barns-Graham Trustee 29 November 2017
None on record
David Edwards Bond Trustee 26 August 2015
None on record
John Trefor Edwards Trustee 09 July 2014
MEMORIAL HALL (DULAS) (EWYAS HAROLD-KENDERCHURCH-KENTCHURCH MEMORIAL HALL)
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER LAURENCE TOMLINSON Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY RONALD CAPON Trustee
None on record