THE COLIN TURNER CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects of the Trust is to provide education for children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Hammersmith And Fulham
Governance
- 10 July 2003: Standard registration
- 03 January 2018: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2013 | 31/07/2014 | 31/07/2015 | 31/07/2016 | 31/07/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.40k | £82.43k | £69.24k | £47.24k | £22.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.96k | £82.43k | £69.24k | £48.46k | £24.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2017 | 01 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2016 | 28 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2016 | 28 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 July 2015 | 15 June 2016 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2015 | 19 September 2016 | 111 days late | |
Annual return | 31 July 2014 | 09 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2014 | 18 September 2015 | 110 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED ON 20TH JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PERSONS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window