Parents Staff and Friends of Coton Church of England (VC) Primary School

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The association seeks to raise funds on behalf of the school, to advance the education and development of the pupils at Coton C of E Primary School. Proceeds of the fund raising will be used to purchase new facilities and equipment, and to maintain and refurbish existing equipment, as determined by the PTA committee, to meet the objectives of the Association.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 19 February 2003: Standard registration
- 21 November 2022: Funds received from 1170718 COTON PRE-SCHOOL
- COTON SCHOOL P.T.A. (Working name)
- COTON SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Martina Valleri | Chair | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wisbey | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elfrida Koroma | Trustee | 08 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Hannah Robertson-Cowley | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anna Machi | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Bain | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Gouldstone | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
George Christer Stephen Wells | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Roseanne Claire Wilkinson | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Kateritsa Petrides | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.55k | £5.23k | £1.65k | £5.55k | £11.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.98k | £3.04k | £5.18k | £4.03k | £29.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1981 AS AMENDED JULY 1990 AND NOVEMBER 22 2001. as amended on 12 Jul 2021 as amended on 12 Jul 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF COTON C.E. (C) PRIMARY SCHOOL ("THE SCHOOL") BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL AND TO ENABLE THIS TO HAPPEN THE ASSOCIATION MAY: (1) FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND (2) ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT; AND (3) FUND RAISE, HOLD AND SPEND MONEY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
COTON SCHOOL PTA
COTON C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
WHITWELL WAY
CAMBRIDGE
CB23 7PW
- Phone:
- 01954210339
- Email:
- psfa@coton.cambs.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window