WORSBROUGH SPORTS AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a voluntary community organisation focussing on different activities, mainly sport, football, cricket and junior cricket, brass band and various community groups meet in our premises.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barnsley
Governance
- 30 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WAYNE JOHNSON | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Raymond Pinder | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jillian Eyre | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JASON ALDERTON | Trustee | 19 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Toone | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Littlewood | Trustee | 15 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Kenneth Bywater | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.84k | £45.72k | £61.33k | £38.51k | £65.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.34k | £36.19k | £73.44k | £41.73k | £27.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.43k | £32.62k | £22.70k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2025 | 153 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 02 April 2025 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2024 | 181 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 April 2024 | 181 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 December 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 November 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
17 November 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2021 | 82 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 January 2021 | 82 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
(A) PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF WORSBROUGH BRIDGE, WARD GREEN, WORSBROUGH COMMON, WORSBROUGH DALE AND WORSBROUGH VILLAGE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD ( HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE AREA OF BENEFIT ) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SAID INHABITANTS; (B) ESTABLISH, OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF, A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND SPORTS GROUND ( HEREINAFTER CALLED 'THE CENTRE' ) AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME ( WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY ) IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS; ("THE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
WORSBROUGH BRIDGE, WARD GREEN, WORSBROUGH COMMON, WORSBROUGH DALE AND WORSBROUGH VILLAGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Mitchell Close
Worsbrough
BARNSLEY
South Yorkshire
S70 4RZ
- Phone:
- 01226350423
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window