ZNANIYE FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Znaniye Foundation delivers services, a wide range of projects and educational programmes to children, youth and families in the various boroughs of London. We recognise the importance of supporting these children and young people to reach their potential, to encourage their self-expression, and to build social interaction and community integration in safe, friendly and stimulating environments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
52 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 January 2004: Standard registration
- Znaniye Foundation (Working name)
- "ZNANIYE" RUSSIAN SCHOOL (Previous name)
- THE RUSSIAN CIRCLE (Previous name)
- ZNANIYE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GYULNARA KANSADIEVA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Ronald Elikem Kofi Logan | Trustee | 25 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sacha Regina Page | Trustee | 04 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Zoheb Islam | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
SUZANNE HILL | Trustee | 15 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
AINA MAMAEVA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.10k | £38.12k | £67.69k | £51.74k | £93.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.44k | £34.25k | £44.83k | £44.57k | £63.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.50k | £22.76k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 01 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED 11 JANUARY 2004 AND 2 OCTOBER 2010 as amended on 03 Sep 2019 as amended on 03 Aug 2020
Charitable objects
C1 To advance the education of children, young people and adults by the provision of classes taught in English, Russian and any other languages that are in demand C2 To relieve people in need who require advice, assistance, representation, counselling, translation and interpretation services C3 To improve the conditions of life and relieve needs of people through the provision of recreational and leisure time activities provided in the interest of social welfare; and by providing support and activities which develop their skills, capacities and capabilities to enable them to participate in society as mature and responsible individuals. C4 The promotion of equality and diversity for the public benefit by advancing education and raising awareness in equality and diversity C5 To develop the capacity and skills of the members of the socially and economically disadvantaged community of the United Kingdom in such a way that they are better able to identify and help meet their needs and to participate more fully in society C6 For the public benefit to promote the education (including social and physical training) of people under the age of 25 years in the United Kingdom in such ways as the charity trustees think fit, including by providing educational services, including the study of music or other arts, or to prepare for entry to any occupation, trade or profession on leaving any educational establishment. C7 To assist and cooperate in such ways as the charity trustees think fit any charity in the United Kingdom, European Union and the World, whose aims include advancing education of persons under the age of 25 years by developing their mental, physical and moral capabilities through leisure time activities C8 To deliver projects and educational programmes to children, youth and families. To support children and young people to reach their potential, to encourage their self-expression, and to build social interaction and community integration in safe, friendly and stimulating environments C9 To help children and young people understand the need for and how to expand their own wellbeing and confidence
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
52 Mayfield Gardens
Hanwell
London
W7 3RH
- Phone:
- 07830218559
- Email:
- ZNANIYE@LIST.RU
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window