Financial history CORNWALL MOBILITY CENTRE LIMITED

Charity Number: 1096745
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.01m £887.10k £999.19k £1.22m £1.25m
Total expenditure £999.34k £854.30k £1.08m £1.21m £1.31m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £356.66k £660.35k £360.41k £471.32k £637.43k
Income - Donations and legacies £2.00k £207.49k £9.84k £25.99k £3.27k
Income - Other trading activities £9.62k £7.00k £15.15k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £980.32k £632.92k £944.54k £1.18m £1.23m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £18.01k £15.24k £13.71k £15.37k £16.57k
Income - Other £2.91k £24.46k £15.95k £1.28k £2.08k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £999.34k £854.30k £1.08m £1.21m £1.31m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £12.37k £11.47k £15.90k £57.38k £44.82k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0