WORKINGTON JUNIORS FOOTBALL CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Junior Football Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 08 May 2003: Standard registration
- 30 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- W.J.F.C. (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2016 | 30/06/2017 | 30/06/2018 | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.59k | £42.77k | £54.78k | £66.99k | £77.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.63k | £44.77k | £56.53k | £66.97k | £77.78k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 28 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 28 April 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2018 | 25 April 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2018 | 25 April 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 1 AUGUST 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN BETWEEN THE AGES OF FIVE AND EIGHTEEN RESIDING IN WORKINGTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR PLAYING FOOTBALL SO AS TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF SUCH CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
WORKINGTON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window