THE ARTS SOCIETY WOODBRIDGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Active arts society based in Woodbridge, Suffolk with over 400 members. Ten lectures each year on fine art subjects and decorative design, each with attendances of over 200 people at each lecture. Hold local study days, visits and holidays to UK and abroad. Supports Church Recorders, Church Trails and Young Art projects for local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Suffolk
Governance
- 24 June 2003: Standard registration
- D.D.F.A.S. (Working name)
- DEBEN DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Nigel Christopher Gibbons | Trustee | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Gartley | Trustee | 21 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Sandy Greenard | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Julia Ratcliffe | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Claire Harrington | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Paul Barratt | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Findley | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|||||
Professor Alexandra Carter | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Barratt | Trustee | 17 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Jill Dicken | Trustee | 15 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.35k | £16.10k | £21.01k | £21.09k | £26.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.20k | £12.44k | £23.30k | £23.74k | £23.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 07 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 OCTOBER 1987 AS AMENDED 19 OCTOBER 1992 AND 21 OCTOBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON 16 OCT 2017 as amended on 15 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
A. THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CULTIVATION, APPRECIATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS; B. THE CONSERVATION AND PRESERVATION OF THE ARTISTIC HERITAGE OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OTHER COUNTRIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND C. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ARTS, CULTURE AND HERITAGE, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION, THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Carrick House
The Grove
Melton
WOODBRIDGE
Suffolk
IP12 1FD
- Phone:
- 01394382815
- Website:
-
theartssocietywoodbridge.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window