CROYDON SICKLE CELL AND THALASSAEMIA SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide support for sickle cell and thalassaemia suffers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Croydon
Governance
- 17 October 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sonia Meikle | Chair | 01 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE SIMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNIE MCDONALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.73k | £11.21k | £7.44k | £13.92k | £11.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.77k | £4.93k | £4.52k | £7.86k | £9.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 May 2024 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 October 2023 | 255 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 April 2021 | 89 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED ON 13 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
1) THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS OF PEOPLE AFFECTED BY SICKLE CELL AND THALASSAEMIA, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS (THE BENEFICIAL CLASS); SO AS TO EMPOWER THEM AND IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. 2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THE BENEFICIAL CLASS SO AS TO IMPROVE THEIR OPPORTUNITIES TO FIND GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT. 3) THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN THE GENERAL POPULATION AND IN PARTICULAR, AMONGST THE BENEFICIAL CLASS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
316-320 Whitehorse Road
Croydon
CR0 2LE
- Phone:
- 0208 251 7259
- Email:
- info@cscats.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window