ST MARY'S WESTERHAM HERITAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote for public benefit by preservation, repair, maintenance, restoration, replacement and improvement of: (i) the heritage and fabric of the Parish Church of St Mary the Virgin, Westerham in the Diocese of Rochester including its various attachments, and (ii) the churchyard, its boundaries and ancient monuments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 03 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Charles Griffiths | Chair | 02 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
David Offen | Trustee | 16 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Francis Fox-Branch | Trustee | 01 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Linda Christine Rodgers | Trustee | 04 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Alison Moran | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susanna Hills | Trustee | 29 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Arthur Charles Nigel Bailey | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Bridget Teresa Hales | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Judith Ellen Duffield | Trustee | 03 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Willcox | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Heather Margaret O'Neill | Trustee | 31 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MR TONY YORK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.88k | £5.90k | £6.05k | £22.25k | £20.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.42k | £294 | £278 | £35.25k | £13.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUNE 2002 AS AMENDED as amended on 24 Sep 2019 as amended on 26 Jun 2024
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, RESTORATION, REPLACEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF:- (I) THE HERITAGE AND FABRIC OF THE PARISH CHURCH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, WESTERHAM IN THE DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO ITS BUILDINGS, BELLS, ORGAN, MONUMENTS, MEMORIALS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, INSTALLATIONS, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS AND (II) THE CHURCHYARD, ITS BOUNDARY WALLS, GATES, TOMBS, MONUMENTS AND MEMORIALS.
Area of benefit
WESTERHAM IN THE DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
MERRIEFIELD
TROTTS LANE
WESTERHAM
TN16 1SD
- Phone:
- 01959565409
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window