ACT AGAINST BULLYING

Charity Number: 1100132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Research bullying and campaign to raise awareness and eradicate bullying.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £4,965
Total expenditure: £2,773

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 October 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • AAB (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Louise Burfitt-Dons Chair
None on record
Brooke India Williams Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
MARK MCCALL GARRITY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.83k £3.34k £14.27k £2.94k £4.97k
Total expenditure £2.48k £2.20k £2.45k £2.40k £2.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 17 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 22 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 07 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 22 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
68 DUKE ROAD
LONDON
W4 2DE
Phone:
03003654457