HALESOWEN ASIAN ELDERLY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Halesowen Asian Elderly Association provides advocacy, advice and information service to our members, who are elderly men and women of Asian origin. We organise and facilitate gentle exercise classes , health awareness and safety courses in our centre. We also arrange, Computers for Health training basic courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 18 June 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lakhjit Singh Singh | Chair | 21 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Parmjit Sahota Sahota | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Rodney | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Bills Bills | Trustee | 02 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED LOAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.10k | £3.84k | £14.84k | £21.25k | £19.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.52k | £633 | £6.53k | £15.22k | £18.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £3.75k | £3.75k | £3.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2025 | 364 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 October 2022 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 FEBRUARY 2002 AS AMENDED 8 APRIL 2003 AND 22 OCTOBER 2009.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PERSONS WITHIN THE ASIAN COMMUNITY OF THE WEST MIDLANDS WHO ARE IN NEED, IN PARTICULAR BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
73 Terrace Street
Rowley Regis
Sandwell
B65 0BQ
- Phone:
- 0121 559 0137
- Email:
- Lakhjit15@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window