THE FRIENDS OF YARDLEY GRANGE NURSING HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Yardley Grange Nursing Home are people who live near to Yardley Grange Nursing Home working together with staff at the home to make life a little more comfortable for the residents. In particular, the Friends raise funds to purchase extra comforts for residents and spend time with those residents who need or want company.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 28 July 2003: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT Charles JONES | Chair | 05 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Rebekah Hatfield | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maxine McMullan | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Audrey Tauliczek | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DOREEN CUFFLIN | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ALAN MARTIN FCIH | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.59k | £518 | £256 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.49k | £0 | £245 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 13 November 2023 | 197 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 16 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JANUARY 2003 AS AMENDED 2 JULY 2003 AND 29 SEPTEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PERSONS RESIDENT AT YARDLEY GRANGE NURSING HOME WHO ARE IN NEED BY REASON OF AGE, INFIRMITY OR ILLNESS BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND OTHER SERVICES WHICH WOULD NOT OTHERWISE BE PROVIDED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
YARDLEY GREAT TRUST
31 OLD BROOKSIDE
BIRMINGHAM
B33 8QL
- Phone:
- 01217847889
- Email:
- ALAN.C.MARTIN.UK@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window