SPIRIT OF LIFE CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
o the advancement of the christian faith worldwide in accordance with the doctrines set out in the statement of faith contained in the schedule o the relief of the poor and needy o the furtherance of religious or secular education o such other charitable objects and for the benefit of such other charitable institutions as the trustees in their absolute discretion shall think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 August 2003: Standard registration
- REVIVAL MINISTRIES UK (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev DIA MOODLEY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Victor Antonysamy | Trustee | 18 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ognyan Mihaylov | Trustee | 01 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £72.23k | £106.05k | £58.94k | £57.53k | £46.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.17k | £60.37k | £52.67k | £53.82k | £59.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £17.47k | £3.91k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 21 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 24 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 19 DECEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
2.2.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE 2.2.2 THE RELIEF OF THE POOR AND NEEDY 2.2.3 THE FURTHERANCE OF RELIGIOUS OR SECULAR EDUCATION 2.2.4 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unity Chapel
Romney Avenue
BRISTOL
BS7 9ST
- Phone:
- 01179070850
- Email:
- admin@spiritoflife.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window