THE GIBSON CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust provides provides grants and assistance to young people in the Gloucestershire and North Wiltshire area and in any developing country worldwide to address a particular domestic, educational or entrepreneurial need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
- Ethiopia
Governance
- 18 March 2003: Standard registration
- 25 February 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2010 | 05/04/2011 | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.12k | £811 | £1.08k | £567 | £456 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.48k | £12.06k | £16.95k | £10.05k | £6.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 06 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 27 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2012 | 05 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2011 | 11 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 20/01/2003 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 01/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29/01/2014
Charitable objects
SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT IN THE COUNTIES OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE AND IN ANY DEVELOPING COUNTRY WORLDWIDE.
Area of benefit
COUNTIES OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE, SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE, WILTSHIRE AND ANY DEVELOPING COUNTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window