Financial history BATH ARTISTS' STUDIOS LIMITED

Charity number: 1102077
Charity reporting is up to date (12 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £121.32k £135.56k £116.72k £124.50k £38.00k
Total expenditure £124.70k £109.73k £116.34k £127.05k £36.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £32.79k £12.14k £0 N/A