Financial history STRATFORD DEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIP FOR REGENERATION

Charity number: 1100318
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016
Total gross income £15.43k £15.37k £38.61k £982 £385
Total expenditure £31.40k £313.07k £2.47k £192.51k £360
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A