STRATFORD DEVELOPMENT PARTNERSHIP FOR REGENERATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES MAY, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, THINK FIT. THE TRUSTEES HAVE TENDED TO FOCUS MAINLY ON THE EAST OF LONDON WHERE THERE ARE HIGH LEVELS OF DEPRIVATION. ACTIVITY HAS DECREASED DUE TO TRUSTEES EVALUATING THE NATURE OF FUNDING AWARDED PREVIOUSLY AND THE NEEDS OF ITS TARGET AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 October 2003: Standard registration
- 12 February 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.43k | £15.37k | £38.61k | £982 | £385 | |
|
Total expenditure | £31.40k | £313.07k | £2.47k | £192.51k | £360 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 14 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 29 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 02 November 2015 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 02 November 2015 | 2 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 19 SEPTEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AS THE TRUSTEES MAY. IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LOCALLY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN GREATER LONDON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window