SECRET WORLD WILDLIFE RESCUE

Charity Number: 1097119
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Secret World Wildlife Rescue (SWWR) exists to relieve the suffering of British wildlife, to encourage respect and tolerance for wildlife and to further its conservation. We do this by: Providing a public rescue, rehabilitation and release service for injured, sick and orphaned wildlife; educating the public, delivering conservation projects, disseminating data and delivering professional training.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Bath And North East Somerset
  • Bristol City
  • Devon
  • Dorset
  • Somerset
  • South Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 September 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Richard Hockey Chair 04 May 2023
None on record
Gail Teresa Burfitt Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Hilary Loveday Bloor Trustee 07 December 2023
None on record
Dr Dominic Simon Markham Phillips Trustee 09 June 2022
None on record
Wendy Jane Goodwin Trustee 12 August 2021
None on record
Chris Stenlake Trustee 06 February 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £908.08k £1.04m £1.38m £1.17m £1.60m
Total expenditure £844.27k £798.01k £920.21k £1.22m £1.35m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £5.94k £31.43k £14.90k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £703.56k £768.85k £1.13m £846.12k £1.22m
Income - Other trading activities £182.84k £183.23k £225.28k £303.75k £356.21k
Income - Charitable activities £16.16k £4.64k £878 £4.42k £10.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £356 £967 £844 £744 £7.36k
Income - Other £5.16k £86.22k £22.61k £10.74k £8.71k
Income - Legacies £440.48k £351.76k £630.26k £452.41k £803.73k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £667.76k £633.16k £743.97k £902.99k £921.89k
Expenditure - Raising funds £176.51k £160.05k £170.81k £305.57k £422.78k
Expenditure - Governance £6.81k £4.80k £5.43k £9.63k £6.88k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £4.80k £5.43k £9.63k £6.88k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £1.04m £1.02m £1.86m £1.95m £1.89m
Long-term investments £627 £627 £627 £627 £627
Other assets £750.48k £1.01m £635.35k £501.53k £821.47k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£10.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £32.84k £29.38k £42.06k £51.56k £59.60k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 14 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28 JUNE 1994 AS AMENDED 27 JANUARY 1997 AND 25 MAY 2005 (AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 11 AUGUST 2005)
Charitable objects
THE CARE AND REHABILITATION OF ORPHANED INJURED OR OTHERWISE DISTRESSED WILDLIFE. TO EDUCATE AND FURTHER THE PUBLIC'S UNDERSTANDING OF WILD CREATURES AND TO ENCOURAGE TOLERANCE APPRECIATION AND RESPECT FOR ALL WILDLIFE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE, SOMERSET.
Registration history
  • 01 September 2005 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Secret World Wildlife Rescue
New Road
East Huntspill
Highbridge
Somerset
TA9 3PZ
Phone:
01278783250