FRED AND MARJORIE SAINSBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making grants and donations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 01 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MERRITA ANN JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SYER BOUSFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL MONTAGU GUY BUTLER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID SHERBORNE HOARE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.00k | £43.30k | £35.62k | £39.77k | £45.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.11k | £39.87k | £48.33k | £41.48k | £57.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 February 2025 | 27 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2023 | 135 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 June 2023 | 135 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 April 2022 | 86 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 April 2022 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 April 2022 | 451 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 April 2022 | 451 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 31 JANUARY 2003
Charitable objects
1. THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME, AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. 2. THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION, FOR THE PERIOD OF 21 YEARS FROM THE DATE OF THIS DEED, INSTEAD OF APPLYING THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN ANY YEAR, ACCUMULATE ALL OR ANY PART OF SUCH INCOME AT COMPOUND INTEREST BY INVESTING THE SAME, AND THE RESULTING INCOME, IN ANY AUTHORISED INVESTMENTS AND HOLD THE SAME AS AN ACCRETION TO AND AS PART OF THE CAPITAL OF THE CHARITY, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THEIR RIGHT TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF SUCH ACCUMULATED INCOME IN ANY SUBSEQUENT YEAR AS IF THE SAME WERE INCOME OF THE CHARITY ARISING IN THE THEN CURRENT YEAR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND WILTSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
NORTHGATE HOUSE
DEVIZES
WILTSHIRE
SN10 1JX
- Phone:
- 01380723611
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window