GEOFFREY WHITWORTH THEATRE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Company's principal activity during the year continued to be the management of the property consisting of the Geoffrey Whitworth Theatre.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bexley
- Kent
Governance
- 20 August 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Grubb | Trustee | 01 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivien Goodwin | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|||||
Lawrence Watling | Trustee | 02 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Webster | Trustee | 03 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Liz Naisbitt | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ADAMS | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
RACHEL LINDSEY | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN HIGGINSON | Trustee | 20 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
LESLEY ROBINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.53k | £46.99k | £96.24k | £147.55k | £117.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.47k | £48.20k | £95.36k | £140.88k | £116.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £37.24k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 19 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 06 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 23 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JULY 1959 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 3 MAY 1988, 21 OCTOBER 1995, 16 OCTOBER 2000, 5 OCTOBER 2002, 19 JULY 2003 AND 9 OCTOBER 2004. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, MAINTAIN , IMPROVE, AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION, ARTISTIC TASTE IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ARTS IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DANCE, DRAMA, MUSIC AND SINGING AND WITHIN SUCH OBJECTS MAKE PARTICULAR PROVISION FOR EDUCATIONAL AND COMMUNITY PROGRAMMES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF BEXLEY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Rowanwood Avenue
SIDCUP
DA15 8WN
- Phone:
- 07740699287
- Email:
- enquiries@thegwt.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window