Accounts and annual returns REVELATION ROCK-GOSPEL CHOIRS

Charity Number: 1096262
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 11 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 January 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 26 May 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 12 April 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required