Financial history REVELATION ROCK-GOSPEL CHOIRS

Charity Number: 1096262
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £6.06k £5.12k £2.03k £330 £5
Total expenditure £7.49k £5.27k £2.08k £611 £2.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A