WANDSWORTH U3A

Charity number: 1096590
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides social & learning opportunities for people no longer in full time employment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £11,874
Total expenditure: £10,570

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Wandsworth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 March 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • WANDSWORTH UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jillian Berthelemy Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Gery Roberts Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Jacqueline Clark Trustee 01 September 2023
None on record
Lynne Jones Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Margaret Jones Trustee 19 June 2023
None on record
Lalit Singh Malik Trustee 20 June 2022
None on record
Andrew Maurice Crane Trustee 07 December 2020
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.56k £6.85k £2.75k £9.47k £11.87k
Total expenditure £10.91k £5.26k £5.99k £8.30k £10.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 11 February 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 08 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 07 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 10 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 07 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Flat 4
Foyer Apartments
2 Malwood Road
LONDON
SW12 8EN
Phone:
07470006914
Website:

U3Asites.org.uk\wandsworthu3a