SIGHTLINE VISION (NORTH WEST) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sightline provides a free confidential telephone befriending service for visually impaired people (befriendees). Sightline focuses its service delivery in England and Wales. The service is delivered by a team of trained volunteers (befrienders), many of whom are themselves visually impaired. A befriendee is matched to a befriender who then have a weekly chat at a date/time that suits both parties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
73 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 March 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER ARNOLD HOWARD | Chair | 04 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Kara Janet Ayres | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hasanga Parkinson | Trustee | 05 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter William Booth | Trustee | 18 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY VICTOR KIMPTON | Trustee | 04 December 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.83k | £28.03k | £79.16k | £89.44k | £66.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.61k | £46.34k | £68.07k | £81.76k | £82.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18TH DECEMBER 2002.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE BLIND OR SUFFER VISUAL IMPAIRMENT BY THE PROVISION OF A BEFRIENDING AND SUPPORT SERVICES AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT SO AS TO TO LIMIT THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE PROVISION OF A TELEPHONE HELPLINE SERVICE FOR THOSE RECENTLY DIAGNOSED WITH SERIOUS VISUAL IMPAIRMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOWICK HOUSE
HOWICK PARK AVENUE
PENWORTHAM
PRESTON
PR1 0LS
- Phone:
- 0800 587 2252
- Email:
- info@sightline.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window