Financial history THE CJD SUPPORT NETWORK

Charity number: 1097173
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £44.25k £57.23k £35.27k £61.30k £101.05k
Total expenditure £45.23k £17.57k £44.07k £34.99k £83.73k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A