Financial history HAWRIDGE & CHOLESBURY C OF E SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1097263
Charity reporting is up to date (244 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £48.78k £27.28k £17.06k £42.64k £45.08k
Total expenditure £35.01k £25.03k £10.19k £38.97k £16.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A