HAWRIDGE & CHOLESBURY C OF E SCHOOL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hawridge and Cholesbury C of E School Fund assists the school in providing and assisting in the provision of educational and recreational acitivities in augmentation of such facilities financed by the local education authority.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 29 April 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Findlay Guerin | Trustee | 26 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Thorp | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Phillips | Trustee | 14 October 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.78k | £27.28k | £17.06k | £42.64k | £45.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.01k | £25.03k | £10.19k | £38.97k | £16.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 March 2025 | 244 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 March 2025 | 244 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 10 July 2024 | 376 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 10 July 2024 | 376 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 NOVEMBER 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS OF HAWRIDGE & CHOLESBURY C OF E SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
HAWRIDGE AND CHOLESBURY C OF E SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hawridge & Cholesbury C of E School
Hawridge Common
Hawridge
Chesham
Buckinghamshire
HP5 2UQ
- Phone:
- 01494758368
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window