THE FRIENDS OF SHAKESPEARE'S CHURCH

Charity number: 1097403
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To maintain, repair, restore, preserve and enhance Holy Trinity Church, Stratford-upon-Avon

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £20,837
Total expenditure: £18,473

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Warwickshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 2003: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Emma Louise Froud Trustee 24 March 2025
None on record
Julia Woodhouse Trustee 25 January 2024
None on record
Timothy Charles Raistrick Trustee 18 July 2023
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
HOLY TRINITY CHARITIES
Received: On time
STRATFORD-ON-AVON MUSIC FESTIVAL
Received: On time
MUNICIPAL CHARITIES OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
THE STRATFORD-UPON-AVON CHAMBER CHOIR
Received: On time
DENNE GILKES MEMORIAL FUND
Received: On time
THE STRATFORD UPON AVON CHAMBER MUSIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
Gillian Ann Cawley Trustee 01 July 2023
None on record
Professor Lindsay MacDonald Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
Catherine Fannin Peel Trustee 19 June 2022
None on record
Jennifer Ewing Trustee 07 April 2022
None on record
Rev Dr Paul Matthew Francis Edmondson Trustee 12 May 2021
THE BRITISH SHAKESPEARE ASSOCIATION
Received: 34 days late
Dr Diana Jane Owen Trustee 17 November 2020
STRATFORD LITERARY FESTIVAL
Received: On time
Michael James Anthony Warrillow Trustee 07 April 2019
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
Rev Patrick James Taylor Trustee 11 February 2014
HOLY TRINITY CHARITIES
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST HELEN'S CHURCH
Received: On time
CLIFFORD CHAMBERS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITIES
Received: On time
JACKSONS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £20.77k £406.80k £6.43k £7.22k £20.84k
Total expenditure £4.66k £17.26k £162.57k £13.94k £18.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £404

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 10 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 12 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE TRUSTEES
THE FRIENDS OF SHAKESPEARE'S CHURCH
HOLY TRINITY CHURCH PARISH OFFICE
OLD TOWN
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 6BG
Phone:
01789266316