MTV EXIT FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creating awareness and prevention of human trafficking and exploitation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Thailand
Governance
- 19 April 2004: Standard registration
- 14 June 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE MTV EUROPE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.76m | £822.47k | £975.66k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.97m | £1.84m | £1.55m | £10.79k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £3.76m | £822.47k | £975.66k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.96m | £1.83m | £1.55m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.36k | £8.89k | £6.60k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 26 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 11 October 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 15 APRIL 2004 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30 MARCH 2010.
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL AND MORAL IMPROVEMENT OF THE PUBLIC IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE BY EDUCATING AND INFORMING THEM ABOUT SOCIAL, CULTURAL AND ECONOMIC ISSUES THAT FACE THEM INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO RACIAL HARMONY, ECONOMIC HARDSHIP, CONSERVATION AND ENVIRONMENTAL ISSUES, SEXUAL EXPLOITATION AND HUMAN RIGHTS: AND (B) SUCH OTHER OBJECT WHICH SHALL FOR THE TIME BEING BE CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECLARE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window