CHERISHED MEMORIES SUPPORT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Creating high profile days of family bonding for life limited children - Each event is video recorded and a DVD sent to each family as a cherished memory of their day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Kent
- Surrey
Governance
- 12 May 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EDWARD JOHN LAMPKIN | Trustee | 21 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN WEBB | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CARSTEN MARK STOKVIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GORDON WILLIAM HENRY PARRY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL FRANCIS LYONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL ALEXANDER HAYES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.00k | £65.07k | £6.93k | £127 | £1.11k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.38k | £32.08k | £30.61k | £7.47k | £3.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 13 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH OCTOBER 2002.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN WITH TERMINAL AND LIFE THREATENING ILLNESSES LOCATED IN SOUTH EAST ENGLAND AND THEIR RESPECTIVE PARENTS AND WELL SIBLINGS TO PROVIDE THEM WITH SPECIAL EVENTS OF FAMILY BONDING THAT OTHERWISE WOULD NOT BE AVAILABLE TO THEM AND WHICH SHALL CREATE A CHERISHED MEMORY FOR THEM FOR AS LONG AS THE CHILDREN LIVE AND HELP PARENTS AND SIBLINGS WITH THEIR HEALING PROCESS WHEN THE CHILDREN DIE PROVIDING A LONG LASTING CHERISHED MEMORY FOR THEM.
Area of benefit
SOUTH EAST ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Chichester Road
Greenhithe
DA9 9JS
- Phone:
- 01322383206
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window