BOLTON NURSERY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide childcare and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £18,551 from 6 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cumbria
Governance
- 19 March 2003: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samuel Parkington | Chair | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Isabelle Hunter | Trustee | 18 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Morphet | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rachael Faustino | Trustee | 30 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELEN SOMERVILLE | Trustee | 28 October 2020 |
|
|||||
Katherine Allison | Trustee | 04 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Tinkler | Trustee | 21 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.44k | £141.43k | £189.91k | £262.07k | £279.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.79k | £134.47k | £166.06k | £227.68k | £259.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £27.20k | £74.33k | £81.68k | £8.49k | £18.55k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 July 2022
(These accounts |
23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 20 June 2022 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 20 June 2022 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 11 June 2021 | 11 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3RD FEBRUARY 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 APRIL 2003
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY FACILITIES COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHTS OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN REGARDLESS OF RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION OR MEANS. (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
COLBY LANE
BOLTON
APPLEBY
CUMBRIA
CA16 6AW
- Phone:
- 01768362468
- Email:
- bolton-nursery@btconnect.com
- Website:
-
bolton-nursery.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window