Register of Charities - The Charity Commission BASIL BEAR FUND
Charity Number: 1053793-6
Removed charity
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24/03/97 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 18/12/2002, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 1ST AUGUST 2006 AND 31 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS OF CHILDREN (INCLUDING CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES) WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN TREATED AT SOUTH WEST ESSEX PRIMARY CARE TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
- 05 March 2003: Standard registration
- 26 June 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
Other names
No other names
This charity is a linked charity of
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.